OK SCR1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR1
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 114-11)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 114-11)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent resolution; urging ratification of Parental Rights Amendment.
Title
Concurrent resolution; urging ratification of Parental Rights Amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - House - House: ADOPT RESOLUTION (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-03 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives except Dollens, Albright, Ranson, Provenzano, Loring, Nichols, Virgin, Brewer, Goodwin, Rosecrants, Waldron, Stone, Munson, Bennett, Perryman, Branham |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen, Bergstrom, Bice, Boggs, Bullard, Coleman, Daniels, David, Dossett, Dugger, Hall, Haste, Howard, Ikley-Freeman, Jech, Kidd, Leewright, McCortney, Montgomery, Murdock, Newhouse, Paxton, Pederson, Pemberton, Pugh, Quinn, Rader, Rosino, Scott, Sharp, Shaw, Silk, Simpson, Smalley, Stanislawski, Stanley, Thompson, Weaver |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Considered |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2019-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR1 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Filed with Secretary of State