OK SCR1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 114-11)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent resolution urging ratification of Parental Rights Amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent resolution urging ratification of Parental Rights Amendment.

Sponsors

Sen. Rob Standridge [R]Rep. Jon Echols [R]Rep. Ken Luttrell [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]
Rep. Harold Wright [R]Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Todd Russ [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]
Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Avery Frix [R]
Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R]Rep. Carol Bush [R]Rep. Meloyde Blancett [D]Rep. Rhonda Baker [R]
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R]Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D]Rep. John Pfeiffer [R]Rep. Mark Lepak [R]
Rep. Marcus McEntire [R]Rep. Kevin McDugle [R]Rep. Ryan Martinez [R]Rep. Jason Lowe [D]
Rep. Mark Lawson [R]Rep. Dell Kerbs [R]Rep. Justin Humphrey [R]Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R]
Rep. Tom Gann [R]Rep. Dean Davis [R]Rep. Denise Hader [R]Rep. Rusty Cornwell [R]
Rep. Sherrie Conley [R]Rep. Trey Caldwell [R]Rep. Ty Burns [R]Rep. Jeff Boatman [R]
Rep. Merleyn Bell [D]Rep. Zack Taylor [R]Rep. Rande Worthen [R]Rep. Tammy West [R]
Rep. Kevin West [R]Rep. Josh West [R]Rep. Collin Walke [D]Rep. Mike Osburn [R]
Rep. Carl Newton [R]Rep. Matt Meredith [D]Rep. Lundy Kiger [R]Rep. Ronny Johns [R]
Rep. Brian Hill [R]Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R]Rep. David Hardin [R]Rep. Jim Grego [R]
Rep. Andy Fugate [D]Rep. Derrel Fincher [R]Rep. Sheila Dills [R]Rep. Jay Steagall [R]
Rep. Marilyn Stark [R]Rep. Chris Sneed [R]Rep. David Smith [R]Rep. Lonnie Sims [R]
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R]Rep. Randy Randleman [R]Rep. Ajay Pittman [D]Rep. Logan Phillips [R]
Rep. Brad Boles [R]Rep. Roger Ford [R]Rep. Mark Vancuren [R]Rep. Tammy Townley [R]
Rep. John Talley [R]Rep. Judd Strom [R]Rep. Danny Sterling [R]Rep. Kenton Patzkowsky [R]
Rep. Daniel Pae [R]Rep. Jim Olsen [R]Rep. Garry Mize [R]Rep. Nicole Miller [R]
Rep. Stan May [R]Rep. Thomas Marti [R]Rep. Robert Manger [R]Rep. Chris Kannady [R]
Rep. Jason Dunnington [D]Rep. Chad Caldwell [R]Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R]
Rep. Charles McCall [R]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R]Sen. Darrell Weaver [R]
Sen. Brenda Stanley [R]Sen. John Montgomery [R]Sen. Brent Howard [R]Sen. John Haste [R]
Sen. Julie Daniels [R]Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R]Sen. J.J. Dossett [D]Sen. Roger Thompson [R]
Sen. Jason Smalley [R]Sen. Joseph Silk [R]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]Sen. Darcy Jech [R]
Sen. Stephanie Bice [R]Sen. Chuck Hall [R]Sen. Bill Coleman [R]Sen. David Bullard [R]
Sen. Casey Murdock [R]Sen. Allison Ikley-Freeman [D]Sen. Paul Rosino [R]Sen. Paul Scott [R]
Sen. Dave Rader [R]Sen. Adam Pugh [R]Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R]Sen. Roland Pederson [R]
Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R]Sen. Joe Newhouse [R]Sen. Greg McCortney [R]Sen. James Leewright [R]
Sen. Chris Kidd [R]Sen. Tom Dugger [R]Sen. Mark Allen [R]Sen. Nathan Dahm [R]
Sen. Larry Boggs [R]Sen. Wayne Shaw [R]Sen. Ron Sharp [R]Sen. Frank Simpson [R]
Sen. Kim David [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2019-04-04HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-04SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-03SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-03HouseAdopted, returned to Senate
2019-04-03HouseCoauthored by all other Representatives except Dollens, Albright, Ranson, Provenzano, Loring, Nichols, Virgin, Brewer, Goodwin, Rosecrants, Waldron, Stone, Munson, Bennett, Perryman, Branham
2019-04-03HouseConsidered
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-13SenateAdopted, referred for engrossment
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen, Bergstrom, Bice, Boggs, Bullard, Coleman, Daniels, David, Dossett, Dugger, Hall, Haste, Howard, Ikley-Freeman, Jech, Kidd, Leewright, McCortney, Montgomery, Murdock, Newhouse, Paxton, Pederson, Pemberton, Pugh, Quinn, Rader, Rosino, Scott, Sharp, Shaw, Silk, Simpson, Smalley, Stanislawski, Stanley, Thompson, Weaver
2019-02-13SenateConsidered
2019-02-13SenateDirect to Calendar
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2019-02-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2019-02-11SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback