OK SB988 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Educational service contractors; repealing provision on certain benefits. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational service contractors; repealing provision on certain benefits. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback