OK SB988 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB988
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Educational service contractors; repealing provision on certain benefits. Emergency.
Title
Educational service contractors; repealing provision on certain benefits. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB988 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019