OK SB987 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB987
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child abuse or neglect; allowing interview during certain investigation. Effective date.
Title
Child abuse or neglect; allowing interview during certain investigation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/15/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | General Order |
2021-03-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB987 (Carry Over) 2021-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/15/2021