OK SB983 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health information technology; creating Health Information Technology Advisory Board; establishing certain operating procedures. Effective date.
Title
Health information technology; creating Health Information Technology Advisory Board; establishing certain operating procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2016 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 9 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-13 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 20 |
2016-04-12 | House | General Order |
2016-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2016-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2016-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (principal House author) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |