OK SB967 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation and water and water rights; providing motor fuel tax exemption for rural irrigation districts. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation and water and water rights; providing motor fuel tax exemption for rural irrigation districts. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-16 | coauthored by Ortega (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Ortega | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 500 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 277 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |