OK SB962 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB962
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County roads; providing immunity from liability for certain claims. Effective date.
Title
County roads; providing immunity from liability for certain claims. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 12 |
2019-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2019-03-27 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Howard |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB962 (Carry Over) 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019