OK SB959 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; making exception for medical marijuana card holder; prohibiting certain denial. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; making exception for medical marijuana card holder; prohibiting certain denial. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback