OK SB943 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health insurance; defining bona fide association health plan; providing requirements for certain health plans. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; defining bona fide association health plan; providing requirements for certain health plans. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback