OK SB941 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Civil procedure; discovery procedure of certain trial preparation materials. Effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; discovery procedure of certain trial preparation materials. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 04/02/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-03-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-03-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11 | |
2012-03-26 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |