OK SB939 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; modifying included substances. Effective date.
Title
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; modifying included substances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/12/2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | General Order |
2018-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |