OK SB935 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State owned vehicles; words painted on state owned vehicles, exempting certain vehicles under certain circumstances. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State owned vehicles; words painted on state owned vehicles, exempting certain vehicles under certain circumstances. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |