OK SB929 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-21 - SCs named Newberry, Brinkley, Halligan, Ford, Ballenger, Eason McIntyre
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-21 - SCs named Newberry, Brinkley, Halligan, Ford, Ballenger, Eason McIntyre
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professional licenses; creating task force to review and evaluate consolidation of licensing functions; providing for organization.
Title
Professional licenses; creating task force to review and evaluate consolidation of licensing functions; providing for organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | SCs named Newberry, Brinkley, Halligan, Ford, Ballenger, Eason McIntyre | |
2012-05-17 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2012-05-16 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-02-13 | Pending removal principal author Representative Sullivan and replace with Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2011-05-19 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2011-05-11 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-05-10 | SCs named Newberry, David, Brinkley, Coates, Laster, Eason McIntyre | |
2011-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-26 | HAs read | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 31 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Rules Committee | |
2011-03-30 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11 | |
2011-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11 | |
2011-03-09 | remove as principal author Representative Jordan and substitute with Representative Sullivan | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |