OK SB925 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB925
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vaccinations; requiring school districts to report certain information to State Department of Health. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Vaccinations; requiring school districts to report certain information to State Department of Health. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 18 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure McCortney |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 21 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Remove as principal author Representative Roberts (Sean) and substitute with Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB925 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - First Reading