OK SB924 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB924
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Immunizations; requiring assisted living centers to post certain information; protecting centers from certain actions. Effective date.
Title
Immunizations; requiring assisted living centers to post certain information; protecting centers from certain actions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB924 (Carry Over) 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee