OK SB920 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB920
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; modifying procedures related to sales tax exemption for certain disabled veterans; providing specified refund. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax; modifying procedures related to sales tax exemption for certain disabled veterans; providing specified refund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB920 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)