OK SB92 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB92
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; expanding actions constituting unfair claims settlement practices. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; expanding actions constituting unfair claims settlement practices. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg McCortney [R] | Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] |
Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Title restored |
2021-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2021-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB92 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Title restored