OK SB91 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings and public works; providing for calculation of savings attributable to performance-based efficiency contracts. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings and public works; providing for calculation of savings attributable to performance-based efficiency contracts. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateApproved by Governor 04/21/2021
2021-04-15SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-04-14SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-14HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2021-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-30HouseCR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
2021-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18SenateEngrossed to House
2021-02-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-02-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
2021-02-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-04SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2021-02-01SenateCoauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Hall
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb91&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB91%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB91%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB91%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB91%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB91%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB91%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB91%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB91_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB91_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback