OK SB908 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Gifts to the state; modifying persons authorized to accept gifts to state. Effective date.
Title
Gifts to the state; modifying persons authorized to accept gifts to state. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 20 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 20 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 24 |
2013-04-25 | House | General Order |
2013-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |