OK SB890 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB890
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists; administering anesthesia and controlled substances; requiring certain insurance policy coverage; immunity. Effective date.
Title
Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists; administering anesthesia and controlled substances; requiring certain insurance policy coverage; immunity. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Smalley [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] |
Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] |
Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Rep. John Talley [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB890 (Carry Over) 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee