OK SB886 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB886
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; adding self-storage facility to list of limited lines producer licenses; establishing procedures for selling certain insurance. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; adding self-storage facility to list of limited lines producer licenses; establishing procedures for selling certain insurance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB886 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019