OK SB884 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals; including Department of Corrections in exemption. Effective date.
Title
Hospitals; including Department of Corrections in exemption. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Corey Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 12 |
2016-04-12 | House | General Order |
2016-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |