OK SB871 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB871
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public Construction Management Act; removing option for subdivisions to require information on contracts.
Title
Public Construction Management Act; removing option for subdivisions to require information on contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB871 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism