OK SB870 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB870
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Juvenile Affairs; expending uses for revolving fund: effective date; emergency.
Title
Office of Juvenile Affairs; expending uses for revolving fund: effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/25/2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-18 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | House | General Order |
2017-05-16 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-05-09 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB870 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017