OK SB869 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB869
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; modifying apportionment of certain revenues. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; modifying apportionment of certain revenues. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-26 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 56 Nays: 6 |
2017-05-24 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 62 |
2017-05-24 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | General Order |
2017-05-16 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB869 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Laid over