OK SB865 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/05/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/05/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Jury instructions; establishing requirements for certain instructions and exhibits. Effective date.
Title
Jury instructions; establishing requirements for certain instructions and exhibits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 55 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 55 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Approved by Governor 04/05/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-03-29 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-29 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 30 | |
2011-03-29 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | First Reading | |
2011-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 17 | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2011-03-01 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-08 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-08 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |