OK SB852 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - HAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Brogdon, Jolley, Nichols, Garrison
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - HAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Brogdon, Jolley, Nichols, Garrison
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Initiative and referendum; providing for gist statement and appeal procedures; providing for duties of Secretary of State and Supreme Court. Effective date.
Title
Initiative and referendum; providing for gist statement and appeal procedures; providing for duties of Secretary of State and Supreme Court. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | HAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Brogdon, Jolley, Nichols, Garrison | |
2009-05-12 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-11 | Conference granted, HC's named Terrill, Miller, Jackson, Jones | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named Brogdon, Jolley, Nichols, Garrison | |
2009-04-22 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-07 | HAs read | |
2009-04-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 9 | |
2009-04-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds | |
2009-04-06 | General Order | |
2009-03-26 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-03-26 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Brogdon | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |