OK SB85 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Opiate antagonists; authorizing certain personnel to administer opiate antagonist. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opiate antagonists; authorizing certain personnel to administer opiate antagonist. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateApproved by Governor 05/29/2019
2019-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseTo Senate
2019-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-05-23HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
2019-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-21SenateTitle restored
2019-05-21SenateCCR read
2019-05-06HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2019-05-02SenateSCs named McCortney, Smalley, Coleman, Rosino, Hicks, Young
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-04-23HouseTitle stricken
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-04-03HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-20HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-19SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-02-19SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush
2019-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb85&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB85%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB85%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB85%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB85%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB85%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB85%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB85%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB85%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB85_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB85_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback