OK SB834 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion; making certain definitions and exceptions relating to abortion uniform. Emergency.
Title
Abortion; making certain definitions and exceptions relating to abortion uniform. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services Senate Bill: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |