OK SB831 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB831
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; revocation or denial of issuance of license; directing appointment of administrative law judge; hearing; emergency order hearing. Effective date.
Title
Child care; revocation or denial of issuance of license; directing appointment of administrative law judge; hearing; emergency order hearing. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Stanley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB831 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee