OK SB823 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB823
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Small farm wineries; creating entry level small farm winery license. Effective date.
Title
Small farm wineries; creating entry level small farm winery license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB823 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)