OK SB820 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Amusements and sports; relating to the Oklahoma Horse Racing Act; modifying expenditures from the Oklahoma Breeding Development Fund Special Account. Effective date.
Title
Amusements and sports; relating to the Oklahoma Horse Racing Act; modifying expenditures from the Oklahoma Breeding Development Fund Special Account. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: R (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: R (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 23 | |
2010-04-21 | Amended | |
2010-04-21 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-04-05 | Title restored | |
2010-04-05 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2009-02-24 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-24 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Nichols | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 200 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3A | 208 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |