OK SB811 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB811
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; providing that certain research is not subject to State Department of Health oversight. Emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; providing that certain research is not subject to State Department of Health oversight. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 12 |
2019-04-22 | House | Amended |
2019-04-22 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB811 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019