OK SB804 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; making exception to prohibited acts of licensees. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; making exception to prohibited acts of licensees. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateApproved by Governor 05/20/2019
2019-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-14SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2019-05-14SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Bell
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb804&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB804%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB804%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB804%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB804%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB804%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB804%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB804%20HAASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB804%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB804%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB804_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB804_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback