OK SB803 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB803
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; providing that optometrists may perform vision screening; adding certain exemptions. Effective date.
Title
Schools; providing that optometrists may perform vision screening; adding certain exemptions. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB803 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)