OK SB80 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB80
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; allowing eligibility based on performance on certain assessments.
Title
Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; allowing eligibility based on performance on certain assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB80 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Emergency clause stricken