OK SB8 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB8
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; authorizing exemption for sales to entities related to the American Legion. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Sales tax; authorizing exemption for sales to entities related to the American Legion. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | General Order |
2019-04-04 | House | Title stricken |
2019-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2019-04-04 | House | Remove Representative Roberts (Sean) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sanders |
2019-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB8 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - HAs read