OK SB794 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB794
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Loans; allowing for certain loan rate for total calculation of loan finance charge. Effective date.
Title
Loans; allowing for certain loan rate for total calculation of loan finance charge. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2023 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 27 |
2023-04-17 | House | General Order |
2023-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2023-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 20 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB794 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2023