OK SB783 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB783
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Bergstrom
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Bergstrom
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; motion picture license; repealers. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; motion picture license; repealers. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Williams (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB783 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Williams (principal House author)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 163 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb783&Session=1800 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB783%20INT.PDF |