OK SB783 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; specifying requirements for ballot titles for county questions; requiring publication. Effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; specifying requirements for ballot titles for county questions; requiring publication. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. John Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-06 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-05 | coauthored by Tibbs, Ritze | |
2009-05-05 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-15 | HAs read | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Wright (John) | |
2009-04-14 | General Order | |
2009-04-08 | Title restored | |
2009-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2009-03-03 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-19 | coauthored by Johnson (principal House author) | |
2009-02-19 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |