OK SB776 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB776
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher certification; removing requirement for certain examinations. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Teacher certification; removing requirement for certain examinations. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Carri Hicks [D] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB776 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee