OK SB774 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB774
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; requiring license, permit or stamp to hunt or fish; establishing licenses by rule. Effective date.
Title
Game and fish; requiring license, permit or stamp to hunt or fish; establishing licenses by rule. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Title restored |
2021-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2021-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB774 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Title restored