OK SB773 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB773
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Medicaid Program; directing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to initiate certain procedures. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Medicaid Program; directing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to initiate certain procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB773 (Carry Over) 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017