OK SB767 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-12 - Placed on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-12 - Placed on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; modifying dates upon which special elections may be held; modifying terms of elective officers. Effective date.
Title
Elections; modifying dates upon which special elections may be held; modifying terms of elective officers. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Placed on Third Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 | |
2009-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Leftwich | |
2009-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 20 | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-06 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Murphey | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 13A | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 3 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb767&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb767_int.rtf |