OK SB766 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB766
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying required service of minimum percentage of sentences. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying required service of minimum percentage of sentences. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dollens (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB766 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - Title stricken