OK SB760 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB760
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Capital Investment Board; dissolving Board; transferring management of certain investments and agreements. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Capital Investment Board; dissolving Board; transferring management of certain investments and agreements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Rep. Jeff Boatman [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Government Modernization and Technology Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Government Modernization and Technology Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Technology |
2023-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Kirt, Rader, Howard, Murdock, Montgomery, Standridge, Floyd |
2023-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-27 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended |
2023-04-27 | House | General Order |
2023-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology |
2023-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kirt |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB760 (Carry Over) 2023-05-19 - Title restored