OK SB756 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; exempting religious schools; modifying appeal procedure. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; exempting religious schools; modifying appeal procedure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Approved by Governor 05/17/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16 | |
2011-05-10 | HAs adopted | |
2011-04-25 | HAs read | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0; Ayes: 48 Nays: 32 | |
2011-04-21 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 221 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 418 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 428 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 605 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 606 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 607 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 608 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 609 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 610 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 612 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 616 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |