OK SB755 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; setting certain restrictions on advertising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; setting certain restrictions on advertising.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2019-03-13SenateEmergency removed
2019-03-13SenateTitle restored
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback