OK SB750 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB750
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Educators' Professional Liability Insurance Program; providing certain insurance coverage for school employees. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Educators' Professional Liability Insurance Program; providing certain insurance coverage for school employees. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB750 (Carry Over) 2019-04-10 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee